BADDELEY GREEN AND STOCKTON BROOK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to distribute the interest received on capital invested to non-profit making organisations and individuals in the local area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 16 February 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Morris MBE | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Morris | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE ANNE FETTES | Trustee |
|
||||||
PAUL ANDREW JENKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY MUNDAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.84k | £8.21k | £6.29k | £6.77k | £7.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.65k | £1.50k | £1.00k | £10.15k | £7.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 26 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 31 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION,WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS. 2) IF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY IS NO LONGER REQUIRED FOR THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE AREA OF BENEFIT, THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY WILL BE THE PROMOTION OF GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
BADDELEY GREEN AND STOCKTON BROOK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 EDGE VIEW ROAD
BADDELEY GREEN
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST2 7JX
- Phone:
- 01782570603
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window