BREWOOD VILLAGE COMMUNITY COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Taking care of the fabric and running a small Village Hall, providing space for local groups e.g. Bridge, Martial Arts, Yoga, WI; Civic Society. In addition, the Hall is used by (a) Music groups providing evening entertainment (b) Birthday parties (c) Wakes (d) Wedding receptions etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 24 October 1963: Standard registration
- JUBILEE HALL EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE (Working name)
- JUBILEE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- BREWOOD VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kim Louise Sisson | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Lee Sisson | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DEBRA BLOWER | Trustee | 20 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARIE POOLE | Trustee | 30 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
DIANE MAY HOLMES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.66k | £42.09k | £41.14k | £47.67k | £55.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.23k | £42.49k | £41.02k | £50.39k | £56.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.88k | £20.57k | £15.54k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4TH MARCH 1938
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BREWOOD AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brewood Village Community Council
Jubilee Hall
6 Bargate Street
Brewood
STAFFORD
ST19 9BB
- Phone:
- 07702 022370
- Email:
- jubileehall9@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window