BROCTON VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a Village Hall for social and educational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 12 December 1962: Standard registration
- BROCTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Pincher | Chair | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Elizabeth Bates | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Michael John Ashton | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Faunch | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Alison Spiers MB BCh BAO | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robin John Bates | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Yvette Tompkins | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Allan BEng | Trustee | 23 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT MUDWAY BEM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.89k | £21.95k | £15.68k | £8.63k | £14.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.00k | £6.93k | £19.99k | £12.96k | £15.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £730 | £21.02k | £11.60k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 31 DECEMBER 1953 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09 FEB 1973
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF A VILLAGE INSTITUTE FOR USE AS A NON SECTARIAN AND NON POLITICAL PLACE OF RECREATION AND SOCIAL INTERCOURSE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BROCTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 SAWPIT LANE
BROCTON
STAFFORD
ST17 0TE
- Phone:
- 01785665497
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window