Accounts and annual returns THE HILTON AND DISTRICT RECREATION GROUND AND SOCIAL WELFARE CENTRE

Charity Number: 522629
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 15 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 20 July 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 09 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required