LONDON AND SOUTH EAST REGION (LASER) EDUCATION FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1208278
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The purpose of the Foundation is to drive opportunities for students of the College and the Trust, by fundraising, sponsorship, research and development of teaching methodologies, growing community networks and partnerships. To scale across London and South East Region and share good practice and the development of community wealth building, as anchor institutions.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Bexley
  • Bromley
  • Greenwich
  • Kent
  • Lewisham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 May 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HELEN MCINTOSH Chair 04 July 2024
THE GREENWICH SOCIETY
Received: On time
ESTATE CHARITY OF WILLIAM HATCLIFFE
Received: On time
DEPTFORD FIRST
Received: On time
Mark Burnett Trustee 04 July 2024
None on record
JULIE ANTHEA ASHER SMITH Trustee 10 January 2024
None on record
RAMA VENCHARD Trustee 01 September 2023
ORCHARD HILL COLLEGE
Received: On time
Roger Dawe Trustee 26 January 2023
None on record
CHRISTINE WHATFORD CBE Trustee 26 January 2023
None on record
Jacky Tiotto Trustee 26 January 2023
None on record
David Eastgate Trustee 26 January 2023
None on record
Dr Helen Samantha Parrett CBE Trustee 07 December 2018
THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOUNDATION
Received: On time
LONDON SKILLS FOR GROWTH LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
Bromley College of FE & HE
Rookery Lane
BROMLEY
BR2 8HE
Phone:
02039544200
Website:

No information available