WOMEN'S WELLBEING LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 April 2024: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Baseema Begum | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Naddia Begum | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Shahanara Chowdhury | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 JUN 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 NOV 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 JAN 2023 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10 NOV 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 JAN 2024 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 APR 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: THE RELIEF OF WOMEN WHO ARE IN NEED, BY WAY OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, UNEMPLOYMENT, ILL HEALTH, DISADVANTAGE THROUGH MENOPAUSE, EXPERIENCE OF ABUSE AND/OR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND NOT HAVING ENGLISH AS A FIRST LANGUAGE, AND FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF: I. PROVIDING FUNCTIONAL SKILLS, LEVEL 1 AND LEVEL 2 QUALIFICATIONS. II. RAISING AWARENESS OF THE DIFFICULTIES FACED BY THOSE IN NEED. III. TALKS AND WORKSHOPS ABOUT DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND MENOPAUSE. UNDERTAKING ALL OTHER LAWFUL ACTIVITIES AS SHALL FURTHER THE COMPANY’S OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
205 Fairgate House
Tyseley
Birmingham
B11 2AA
- Phone:
- 07941364718
- Email:
- shabanaq77@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.