DENSTONE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a meeting place for community organisations in Denstone including a preschool playgroup and a club specifically for the elderly. There is also a stage for amateur dramatic and live music performances. Fund raising to support the maintenance and improvement of the facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 12 September 1963: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susanne Smith | Chair | 13 January 1998 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Mycock | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janie Whiteland | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Ann Stratton | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gill Brown | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Shooter | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Smith | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian David Shooter | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Shermer | Trustee | 07 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
NANCY TURNER | Trustee | 17 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
David T Boden | Trustee | 26 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ALAN BEAUMONT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.06k | £23.26k | £23.48k | £28.15k | £18.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.97k | £26.02k | £28.47k | £34.06k | £15.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.33k | £16.86k | £3.70k | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 11TH MARCH 1947
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF DENSTONE AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 NARROW LANE
DENSTONE
UTTOXETER
ST14 5DR
- Phone:
- 01889590554
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window