SPUN GLASS THEATRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the arts for the public benefit by the promotion in particular, but not exclusively, of the art of drama. To enhance the development and education of children aged 0-4 years by offering appropriate play, education and support services and facilities for them and their parents/carers, in particular but not exclusively through the provision of immersive arts workshops and activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2025
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 March 2024: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Cheetham | Chair | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Aiton | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE HAYLEY STEAD BURGESS | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Levene | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 NOV 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 OCT 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 MAR 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE:- 1) TO ADVANCE THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, OF THE ART OF DRAMA. 2) TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AGED 0-4 YEARS BY OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND SUPPORT SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR THEM AND THEIR PARENTS/CARERS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF IMMERSIVE ARTS WORKSHOPS AND OTHER ARTS ACTIVITIES RELATED TO DRAMA, MUSIC AND DANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 SAXON ROAD
HASTINGS
TN35 5HH
- Phone:
- 07746313410
- Email:
- jessica@spunglasstheatre.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.