FULFORD VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of the Village Hall to support and promote local activities. The Village Hall is held upon trust for the benefit of the inhabitants of Fulford and its immediate vicinity for the purposes of physical and mental training and recreation and social, moral and intellectual development. It can be hired for any reasonable purpose and is used by a number of regular groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 31 July 1963: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Barnard | Chair | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Reginald Preston | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Allen-Fletcher | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Brian | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Dalley | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Wilkinson | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Brian | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Talbot | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Unwin | Trustee | 14 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Patrick John Conlon | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Anthony Hooley | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JEAN MARY CONLON | Trustee | 04 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPHINE BARNARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR MARTIN OXBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.09k | £10.96k | £19.68k | £23.44k | £28.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.21k | £15.56k | £19.34k | £20.81k | £24.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.50k | £11.20k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 March 2024 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF GIFT DATED 21ST MAY 1948 AND SUPPLEMENTAL TRUST DEED DATED 21ST MARSH 1951 AND COMMISSIONERS SCHEME OF 5TH SEPTEMBER 2001.
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FULFORD AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Fulford Road
Fulford
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST11 9QT
- Phone:
- 01782393141
- Email:
- fulfordvillagehall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
fulfordvillagehall.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window