Trustees FULFORD VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 522663

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Barnard | Chair | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Reginald Preston | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Allen-Fletcher | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Brian | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Dalley | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Wilkinson | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Brian | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Talbot | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Unwin | Trustee | 14 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Patrick John Conlon | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Anthony Hooley | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JEAN MARY CONLON | Trustee | 04 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPHINE BARNARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR MARTIN OXBY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.