VILLAGE HALL, HILDERSTONE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hilderstone Village Hall is a widely used community facility - the hall is maintained to a high standard - it offers safe parking for up to 40 vehicles including a designated disabled area. The hall offers high speed broadband to its users. The hall is available for hire to residents and non residents for parties & functions and is well used my many organisations for meetings & training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 10 June 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy William Handley | Chair | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jayne Sneyd | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Thomas Shelley | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Williams | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Mary Woodward | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Elizabeth Britton | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Margaret Bane | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Iain Andrew Britton | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.51k | £31.39k | £29.74k | £22.12k | £14.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.60k | £25.46k | £23.75k | £16.26k | £13.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.77k | £3.20k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 September 2024 | 214 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30TH MARCH, 1949 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01 SEP 2020
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HILDERSTONE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hilderstone Village Hall
Sandon Road
Hilderstone
STONE
Staffordshire
ST15 8SF
- Phone:
- 07810332559
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window