Governing document OLDHAM BOXING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT CENTRE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 APR 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 AUG 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 APR 2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23 JUN 2023 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19 OCT 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:- 3.1 THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF OLDHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE SPORT OF BOXING; AND 3.2 TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF OLDHAM IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
OLDHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.