Trustees KINGSWINFORD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 522686

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Aylett | Chair | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tony Aquino | Trustee | 11 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Hall | Trustee | 11 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Armitage | Trustee | 11 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Price | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
IAN PRICE | Trustee | 10 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
GERALDINE HAMMONDS | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Sheldon | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Knott | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Sheldon | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tim Lannon | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.