WHEATON ASTON SPORTS AND SOCIAL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Indoor and Outdoor facilities for the use of the Parishioners of Lapley, Stretton and Wheaton Aston and any visitor or guest to the Parish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 07 September 1967: Standard registration
- LAPLEY AND WHEATON ASTON RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas James Hammond | Chair | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clifford John Francis | Trustee | 03 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALISON CORR | Trustee | 03 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS EDWARD NOBLETT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.04k | £10.71k | £23.89k | £72.63k | £39.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.82k | £4.73k | £25.48k | £61.31k | £45.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 4 FEBRUARY 1966
Charitable objects
A RECREATION GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LAPLEY AND WHEATON ASTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 High Street
Wheaton Aston
Wheaton Aston
ST19 9NP
- Phone:
- 01785840440
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window