HUDSWELL VILLAGE PLAYERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE MUSICAL AND DRAMATIC ARTS AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING TRAINING IN THE SKILLS ASSOCIATED WITH ARTISTIC PRACTICE AND STAGING ARTISTIC PERFORMANCES, PLAYS, DRAMAS, COMEDIES, OPERAS, OPERETTAS AND OTHER DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC WORKS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 15 September 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jordan Hamilton-Leighton | Chair | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Robinson | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clair Boddy | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE MUSICAL AND DRAMATIC ARTS AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING TRAINING IN THE SKILLS ASSOCIATED WITH ARTISTIC PRACTICE AND STAGING ARTISTIC PERFORMANCES, PLAYS, DRAMAS, COMEDIES, OPERAS, OPERETTAS AND OTHER DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC WORKS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 HEBRON COURT
STOKESLEY
MIDDLESBROUGH
TS9 5FD
- Phone:
- 07736949695
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window