KERNOW KIDNEY PATIENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kernow Kidney Patient Association is a charity run by patients and carers for patients and carers. It aims to support those with chronic kidney conditions through offering support information and advice and a chance to network with other patients. We also offer advice to the wider community and hope to raise awareness of kidney conditions and to fundraise to support the objectives of the charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 06 October 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
michael savage | Trustee | 18 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
KarenElaine Richardson | Trustee | 18 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
sharon clarke | Trustee | 18 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
sophia clarke | Trustee | 18 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
CAROL KIMBERLEY | Trustee | 18 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £625 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 September 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 September 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG KIDNEY PATIENTS AND THEIR CARERS OR FAMILIES ACROSS CORNWALL BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, ADVICE AND INFORMATION IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING KIDNEY DISEASES AND THEIR TREATMENTS, INCLUDING THE IMPORTANCE OF ORGAN DONATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILL CREST
COVERACK BRIDGES
HELSTON
CORNWALL TR13 0LX
- Phone:
- 07759968804
- Email:
- kernowkidneycare@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window