West Jesmond Allotments CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide facilities for allotment gardening for those who live in Newcastle upon Tyne. In addition to our normal allotment plots we have individual raised beds suitable for use by those with difficulties due to age or disability. We also have a modern ecotoilet on site.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 31 October 2023: CIO registration
- WJA CIO (Working name)
- WEST JESMOND ALLOTMENT CIO (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Michael Waddell | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Johanna Theresia Frehen | Trustee | 26 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julian Hargreaves | Trustee | 16 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Barnes | Trustee | 16 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Taylor | Trustee | 16 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Christine Ingram | Trustee | 16 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Francis Mogg | Trustee | 16 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Craig Steele | Trustee | 16 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Guy Herzmark | Trustee | 16 December 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 31 Oct 2023 as amended on 29 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY PROVIDING ALLOTMENT GARDENS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATIONAL LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE LIVES OF ALL RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 Strathmore Road
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE3 5JS
- Phone:
- 07510515559
- Email:
- wjaamemsec@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window