THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SOUTH LANCING AND SOMPTING

Charity Number: 1205535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides buildings/facilities/open space (halls and places of worship) Provides services Generally advancing the religion Educating people about the religion Pastoral care, outreach Missionary, evangelical activities Conducting religious ceremonies such as the celebration of marriages or funerals Maintaining public churchyards and other public religious burial places

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £201,955
Total expenditure: £221,365

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 November 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SOUTH LANCING AND SOMPTING PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Felix Aaron Jerome Smith Chair 19 September 2017
None on record
Rosemary Kirsch Trustee 26 April 2025
None on record
Joanne Lansley Trustee 26 April 2025
None on record
Edwina Joan Rosalie Weekes Trustee 27 April 2024
None on record
Anne Marie Gisby Trustee 27 April 2024
None on record
Stephen David Gates Trustee 27 April 2024
None on record
Rebecca Elizabeth Georgina Connolly Trustee 27 April 2024
None on record
Ian Lloyd Tout Trustee 27 April 2024
None on record
GILLIAN MARY KERNEY Trustee 27 April 2024
None on record
Margaret Ann Burton Trustee 27 April 2024
None on record
AEDAN KERNEY Trustee 27 April 2024
THE BOUNDSTONE CHORUS
Received: On time
Rev Ben Shane Scott Trustee 25 June 2023
The Parochial Church Council of the Ecclesiastical Parish of Lancing with Coombes
Received: On time
LANCING AND SOMPTING CHURCHES FOODBANK
Received: On time
MICHAEL GUY TRISTRAM Trustee 29 April 2023
FRIENDS OF BINSTED CHURCH
Received: On time
SUSSEX TRADITIONS
Received: On time
ARUN COUNTRYSIDE TRUST
Received: On time
SUSTAINABLE SUSSEX
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF SOMPTING CHURCH
Received: On time
Avril Hunniball Trustee 29 April 2023
None on record
AMANDA CLAIRE UPFIELD Trustee 29 April 2023
None on record
Judy Lyell Warren Excell Trustee 29 April 2023
None on record
Catherine Patricia Allen Trustee 29 April 2023
None on record
Patrick Noel Walpole Trustee 29 April 2023
None on record
KATHERINE HELEN AYLING Trustee 30 April 2022
None on record
Jacqueline Offord Trustee 30 April 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2024
Total gross income £201.96k
Total expenditure £221.37k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 01 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 01 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST MICHAEL'S VICARAGE
117 PENHILL ROAD
LANCING
BN15 8HD
Phone:
01903753653