GREENWAY-LAYBORN PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 522712
Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sandwell Metropolitan Council is a unitary local authority within the West Midlands delivering a range of services including recreational provision at the park we have a MUGA face and gym equipment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Total income: £3,442
Total expenditure: £3,442

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Sandwell

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 January 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • LAYBOURNE PARK (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SANDWELL MBC ADULT AND COMMUNITY Trustee 01 June 2001
BROADWELL PARK
Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
SANDWELL MBC Trustee 01 June 2001
WEST SMETHWICK PARK
Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
HARRY MITCHELL PARK
Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
BIRCHLEY PLAYING FIELDS
Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
BURYHILL PARK
Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
OAKWOOD HOUSE TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
WARLEY PARK
Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
LANGLEY PARK OLDBURY
Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
RECREATION GROUND
Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
BIRCHLEY PARK
Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
BROADWELL PARK
Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
DARTMOUTH PARK
Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
THE KENRICK PARK
Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
HADEN HILL PARK
Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
BARNFORD PARK, OLDBURY
Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
THE LIGHTWOODS PUBLIC PARK
Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
THE ART FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.25k £3.66k £2.67k £3.34k £3.44k
Total expenditure £3.25k £3.66k £2.67k £3.34k £3.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SANDWELL COUNCIL HOUSE
FREETH STREET
OLDBURY
WEST MIDLANDS
B69 3DE
Phone:
01215694248