Financial history LEA HALL MINERS WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 522715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £75.06k £86.37k £194.97k £127.33k £142.15k
Total expenditure £89.20k £105.42k £200.36k £143.34k £160.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A