LEA HALL MINERS WELFARE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Many sporting/leisure facilities are provided for the local community, including football, karate,bowls, snooker,pool, kick boxing, dancing, bingo, and flower arranging, etc. Many local organisations (like , Rugeley Stroke Club and Miners Memorial Society) use the premises, plus the WEA which provides art classes. The Welfare Centre is at the heart of the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 04 November 1976: Standard registration
- BRERETON MINERS' WELFARE RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- LEA HALL COLLIERY MINER'S WELFARE CENTRE (Previous name)
- LEA HALL MINER'S WELFARE CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Martin | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Charles Ryan | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Lindley | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Hartshorne | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Batey | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Smith | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Watkiss | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.06k | £86.37k | £194.97k | £127.33k | £142.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.20k | £105.42k | £200.36k | £143.34k | £160.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF 12 JANUARY 1965 AND 4 NOVEMBER 1976 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 4TH AUGUST 2003
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A WELFARE CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS (AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, SUCH OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AS ARE MEMBERS OF THE MINING COMMUNITY) OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
RUGELEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lea Hall Miners Welfare Centre
Sandy Lane
RUGELEY
WS15 2LB
- Phone:
- 0300 102 0175
- Email:
- office@leahallrugeley.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window