Trustees SALT VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 522718

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Harry Wild | Chair | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Sharman | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Richard Baldwin | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann Elizabeth Bell | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Clancy | Trustee | 05 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Edward Harrison | Trustee | 05 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM MITCHELL | Trustee | 12 April 1995 |
|
|
||||
Jane Mitchell | Trustee | 05 April 1995 |
|
|
||||
Christine Crookes | Trustee | 05 April 1992 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.