Financial history MITCHELL MEMORIAL YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 522725
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £19.15k £27.15k £1.21k £0 £0
Total expenditure £91.63k £129.73k £228.10k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A