Trustees SWYNNERTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 522732

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID BUTLER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stefan Amison | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Amison | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kingsley Leigh | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|||||
David Harman | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Linda Mottram | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roy James | Trustee | 17 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Lynne Williams | Trustee | 01 April 2012 |
|
|||||
DAVID ERNEST FARR | Trustee | 12 March 1990 |
|
|
||||
JEAN HARPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICHOLAS CHEADLE | Trustee |
|
||||||
FRANCIS CHEADLE | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID SWANN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANITA DAWN BROUGH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.