Financial history RANGEMORE RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 522736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £4.14k £4.08k £18.66k £12.74k £7.70k
Total expenditure £5.55k £3.06k £12.71k £15.65k £5.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £15.34k £2.29k N/A