Financial history TRYSULL AND SEISDON PLAYING FIELDS

Charity number: 522738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £8.52k £4.77k £8.71k £9.79k £10.90k
Total expenditure £8.20k £11.51k £12.36k £13.46k £10.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A