DARLINGTON COMMUNITY THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to advance the education of the public in the performing arts by establishing and operating a community theatre in Darlington and its surrounding areas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Darlington
Governance
- 04 October 2023: CIO registration
- DCT (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Anne Pattison | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Louise Mason | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul David Mason | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julian Paul Pinkney | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jayne Broadhurst | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PERFORMING ARTS BY ESTABLISHING AND OPERATING A COMMUNITY THEATRE IN DARLINGTON ITS SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Darlington Community Theatre
195-199 NORTHGATE
DARLINGTON
DL1 1UB
- Phone:
- 07766554333
- Email:
- info@dctheatre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window