TRAIN REPEAT COMPETE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help people in unfunded sports in state school on a high level of achievement in sports
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 December 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Macbryde MR | Chair | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Munden | Trustee | 26 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN SPIERS | Trustee | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF TRAIN REPEAT COMPETE IS THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 18 YEARS OLD INCLUDING THOSE WITH DISABILITIES, LIVING WITHIN 30 MILES OF LYDNEY GLOUCESTERSHIRE, BY PROVIDING FUNDING SUPPORT TO ENABLE THEM TO TAKE PART IN AMATEUR SPORTING ACTIVITIES IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, CHEER OR TAEKWONDO, TRAINING, COMPETITIONS, AND DEVELOPMENT WHICH THEY WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO AFFORD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 OLD STATION CLOSE
BLAKENEY
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
GL15 4BE
- Phone:
- 07474118815
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.