DAWLISH AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1206180
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing educational and social services for people no longer in full time employment in Dawlish and the surrounding area.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 December 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Francis Vick Chair 19 February 2018
HMC PROJECTS IN CENTRAL AND EASTERN EUROPE
Received: On time
Robert George Clark Trustee 16 September 2024
None on record
Charlotte Emma May Trustee 16 September 2024
None on record
Rosalind Margaret Summerton Trustee 18 March 2024
None on record
George Frederick Mansfield Trustee 18 September 2023
None on record
Khim Sim Grace Tan-Mepham Trustee 18 September 2023
None on record
Barry Baker Trustee 20 September 2021
None on record
Kathleen Francoise McCarthy Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record
Michael John Heyden Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
14 WESTERN HOUSE
GATEHOUSE HILL
DAWLISH
14 WESTERN HOUSE,
GATEHOUSE HILL
EX7 0DX
Phone:
07340127421