PRESTIGE SUPPORT FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention or relief of poverty for the public benefit in Northamptonshire, and such other parts of the UK as the trustees shall from time to time determine, by providing grants, items and services to individuals in need and/or charities, or other organisations working to prevent or relieve poverty.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
Governance
- 30 October 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Nunley | Chair | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Darren Bowman | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Chapman | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Ibrahim | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Baker | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO IS: THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN NORTHAMPTONSHIRE, AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UK AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Prestige Homeseeker Park and Leisur
8 Shipton Way
Express Business Park
NN10 6GL
- Phone:
- 01933354000
- Email:
- psf@phplh.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.