VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 522759
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Offley Hay Village Hall provides facilities for local organisations and residents to get together. Regular users include Bridge Club, Art Group, Men's Keep Fit, Tia Chi, Women's Institute and Ladies Circle. It is also used for one off hire e.g. parties, weddings, Caravan Club weekends etc..

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £18,838
Total expenditure: £14,469

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 December 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • OFFLEY HAY VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
  • OFFLEY HAY VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Perrott Trustee 15 February 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.85k £21.43k £19.96k £10.64k £18.84k
Total expenditure £7.94k £4.20k £7.86k £12.04k £14.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.77k £11.20k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 February 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
cherry cottage
Sandy Lane
Bishops Offley
STAFFORD
st21 6hg
Phone:
07851638633
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available