DUNMOS C.I.O.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of the poor, the advancement of the Orthdox Jewish faith and the advancement of Orthodox Jewish religious education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 October 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bernard Dunner | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nechama Dunner | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID FORDSHAM | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 12 May 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 14 May 2025 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE (I) THE RELIEF OF THE POOR SICK FEEBLE AND FRAIL THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONGST THE MEMBERS OF THE JEWISH FAITH (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH AND (III) THE ADVANCEMENT OF ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGIOUS EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Derwent House
Lakeside Court
Fifth Avenue
Team Valley Trading Estate
Tyne And Wear
NE11 0NL
- Phone:
- 01914779944
- Email:
- bernard@whitehalluk.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window