Trustees GREAT BRIDGEFORD VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 522764

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phillip Causer | Chair | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chris Roberts | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Turnbull | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Carol Ann Jones | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Norman Greatholder | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Ingle | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Joan Longstaff | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Kulikowski | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joan Ann Blake | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Denise Clare Perry-Miller | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER DAVID LONGSTAFF | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.