Financial history OULTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 522771
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £36.64k £27.26k £34.14k £31.50k £30.93k
Total expenditure £31.13k £12.68k £16.37k £22.88k £24.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £19.97k £19.50k £4.49k £2.00k N/A