Trustees TITTENSOR VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 522774

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Teresa Dianne Rogers | Chair | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Renske Moorman | Trustee | 23 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gil Jazzie | Trustee | 23 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katie Kenyon | Trustee | 23 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Johnston | Trustee | 23 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jazzie | Trustee | 23 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew David Goodwin | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Calder | Trustee | 31 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Debra Broadhurst | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.