GREAT WOOD COMMUNITY HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a community facility for meetings, parties, shows, clubs, social clubs, youth club, keep fit classes, martial arts and other pastime activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 30 July 1963: Standard registration
- TEAN VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID BALL | Chair | 20 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
DEBRA SEATON | Trustee | 03 June 2014 |
|
|||||
Denise Wheat | Trustee | 12 September 2013 |
|
|||||
HELEN ANNE SMYTHEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.99k | £45.48k | £26.47k | £13.67k | £17.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.25k | £16.42k | £19.29k | £19.47k | £27.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £41.15k | £14.00k | £1.00k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 08/02/1960 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 11/09/2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 31/01/2012
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
VILLAGE OF UPPER TEAN AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Greatwood Hall
Hollington Road
Tean
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST10 4JY
- Phone:
- 07989984188
- Email:
- helen@smytheman.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window