FOTIB FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FOTIB aims to promote education, mentoring and training including social and physical training of learners for the public benefit by providing educational equipment like books, stationeries, supporting school and educational trips, tradesmanship sponsorship, payment of examination fees and extra tuition for struggling learners, Providing information about local training activities,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 October 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Florence Bello | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Theophilus Bello | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Odunayo Basorun | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF LEARNERS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING: • FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE; • ACCESS TO ADDITIONAL TUTORING, SUPPORT AND MENTORING; • ACCESS TO EXTRACURRICULAR ACTIVITIES; • SUPPORT TO THOSE IN VOCATIONAL OR TECHNICAL EDUCATION; AND • ADVOCACY
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 CAMPBELL AVENUE
ILFORD
IG6 1EB
- Phone:
- 07932372517
- Email:
- fotibfoundation@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window