Financial history WOODSEAVES VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 522801
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £10.73k £6.09k £1.61k £11.95k £14.49k
Total expenditure £9.46k £5.97k £4.03k £5.14k £22.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £3.20k £4.00k