ASTON CANTLOW VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintains and runs a Village Hall and associated playground for mainly local use
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £900 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 04 October 1963: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL ASTON CANTLOW CP (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
nicholas charles robert isaac | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Deakin | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ciaran Aldridge | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
David George Hannaford | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.43k | £37.98k | £30.28k | £28.78k | £42.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.47k | £21.84k | £37.62k | £48.82k | £35.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £17.67k | £1.95k | £1.00k | £900 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 28 JUNE 1960. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 1ST OCTOBER 2002 as amended on 26 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ASTON CANTLOW AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ASTON CANTLOW AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 GUILD ROAD
ASTON CANTLOW
HENLEY-IN-ARDEN
B95 6JA
- Phone:
- 01789488447
- Email:
- info@davidhannaford.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window