CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST, THRONE OF GRACE PARISH.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CCC Throne of grace parish organises seminars and revival to advance christian faith. We conduct discussion groups and offer counselling to support the community. We raise awareness and understanding of our beliefs by setting up annual charity events whereby the community congregates, listen to words of God, socialise and distribute religious materials.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 October 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kayode Richard Abeleje | Chair | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Orighomisan Faith Remere | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adeola Akinpelu | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH AS SET OUT IN THE HOLY BIBLE BY PROPAGATING THE DOCTRINES OF CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST AS THE TRUSTEE DEEM FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 4 FIRST TIER INDUSTRIAL ESTATE
FREDERICK STREET
Walsall
WS2 9NJ
- Phone:
- 07448014607
- Email:
- cccthroneofgod23@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window