Accounts and annual returns CRAWFORD MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 522837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 January 2023 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 January 2023 437 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 August 2022 650 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required