CRAWFORD MEMORIAL HALL

Charity Number: 522837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Rent of Hall for Community Activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £24,562
Total expenditure: £25,794

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 October 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William D Fleming Chair 23 November 2021
None on record
Laura Broadhurst Trustee 13 September 2023
None on record
Roger Barry Green Trustee 01 February 2023
None on record
Lorraine Christianne Mansfield Trustee 14 October 2021
CLOPTON COMMUNITY ACTION GROUP
Received: 11 days late
Sam Green Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £17.04k £22.40k £24.15k £12.77k £24.56k
Total expenditure £21.91k £15.85k £16.80k £24.04k £25.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £16.86k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 January 2023 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 January 2023 437 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 August 2022 650 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7TH JUNE 1968
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
BIDFORD ON AVON
Registration history
  • 01 October 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
The Crawford Memorial Hall
Salford Road
Bidford-On-Avon
ALCESTER
Warwickshire
B50 4EZ
Phone:
07899971943
Website:

No information available