Trustees CRAWFORD MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 522837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William D Fleming Chair 23 November 2021
None on record
Laura Broadhurst Trustee 13 September 2023
None on record
Roger Barry Green Trustee 01 February 2023
None on record
Lorraine Christianne Mansfield Trustee 14 October 2021
CLOPTON COMMUNITY ACTION GROUP
Received: 11 days late
Sam Green Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record