FIRST CHURCH OF CHRIST SCIENTIST RICHMOND SURREY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of the Christian Science Religion
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 January 2024: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN SMART | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Appleby | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Martin Sisson | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 23 DEC 1935
Charitable objects
RELIGIOUS PURPOSES THEREOF SO AS TO PROMOTE THE CAUSE OF CHRISTIAN SCIENCE IN SUCH WAYS ONLY AS ARE STRICTLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHING AND PRACTICE OF CHRISTIAN SCIENCE AS SET FORTH IN "SCIENCE AND HEALTH WITH KEY TO THE SCRIPTURES" BY MARY BAKER EDDY AND WITH THE BYE-LAWS OF THE MOTHER CHURCH , THE FIRST CHURCH OF CHRIST SCIENTIST IN BOSTON MASSACHUSETTS IN THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIRST CHURCH OF CHRIST SCIENTIST
35 SHEEN ROAD
RICHMOND
TW9 1AD
- Phone:
- 02089401788
- Email:
- info@fccsrichmond.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.