Financial history ALLEN'S CROSS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 522842
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £187.74k £129.30k £68.16k £101.34k £128.35k
Total expenditure £179.95k £121.04k £99.35k £107.73k £121.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £46.05k £58.95k £48.95k £72.65k £71.76k