SERENGETI SCHOLARSHIPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the charity are aimed at relieving the poverty of education in East Africa, especially in the Serengeti District of the Mara Region of Tanzania, of principally girls and young women who have neither the financial nor material resources to provide for themselves, by advancing their full-time education including the award of scholarships, maintenance awards and grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Tanzania
Governance
- 21 November 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Heylings MA, MSc | Chair | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Heylings | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev George Moffat BD, MA | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 AUG 2022 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 20 NOV 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF EDUCATION IN EAST AFRICA AND ESPECIALLY IN THE SERENGETI DISTRICT OF THE MARA REGION OF TANZANIA, OF PRINCIPALLY GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN WHO HAVE NEITHER THE FINANCIAL NOR MATERIAL RESOURCES TO PROVIDE FOR THEMSELVES, BY ADVANCING THEIR FULL-TIME EDUCATION IN SECONDARY OR POST-SECONDARY SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES AND GRANTS FOR TUITION FEES, ACCOMMODATION, FOOD, CLOTHING, ESSENTIAL EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS AND TRAVEL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MERRETTS COTTAGE
THE STENDERS
MITCHELDEAN
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
GL17 0JE
- Phone:
- 01594542334
- Email:
- wigpool44@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window