Accounts and annual returns BIRMINGHAM FEDERATION OF CLUBS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE

Charity number: 522850
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 June 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 26 June 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 27 January 2017 On Time