Governing document BIRMINGHAM FEDERATION OF CLUBS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 OCTOBER 1955 AS AMENDED 8 JANUARY 1997 AND 17 JUNE 1998, AND RENEWAL LEASE DATED 4 AUGUST 1999, AS AMENDED 19 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PERSONAL, SOCIAL, PHYSICAL AND MORAL DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PERSONS RESIDENT IN BIRMINGHAM, PARTS OF HEREFORD AND WORCESTER AND SANDWELL IN ORDER THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF ABOVE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
CITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.