EXMOUTH PRIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ACROSS EXMOUTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROMOTING AND STAGING AN ANNUAL LGBT FESTIVAL WITH ADDITIONAL SMALLER EVENTS THROUGHT THE YEAR
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 23 October 2023: CIO registration
- 01 November 2023: Funds received from 1187660 EXMOUTH PRIDE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Marston | Chair | 23 October 2023 |
|
|||||
David Emlyn James | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Collette Eaton-Harris | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Everall | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Oct 2023 as amended on 15 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
'THE OBJECTS ARE: THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ACROSS EXMOUTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY:- (A) PROMOTING AND STAGING AN ANNUAL LGBT FESTIVAL WITH ADDITIONAL SMALLER EVENTS THROUGHOUT THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITH THE SUPPORT OF THE LOCAL LGBT BUSINESS AND VOLUNTEER COMMUNITY; (B) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN PARTICULAR THROUGH CELEBRATING THE DIVERSITY OF THE LGBT COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; (C) UNITING THE LGBT COMMUNITY, TOGETHER WITH THEIR FAMILIES AND FRIENDS, SO THEY CAN FEEL SAFE, WELCOMED AND PROUD TO BE THEMSELVES AT OUR EVENTS; (D) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING GENERAL AWARENESS AMONG THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE ISSUES AND CHALLENGES FACING THE LIVES OF THE LGBT COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; (E) ASSOCIATING WITH VOLUNTARY, PUBLIC AND PRIVATE SECTOR ORGANISATIONS TO DEVELOP AND MAXIMISE THE EFFECTIVENESS OF THE CHARITY FOR LGBT PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; AND (F) APPLYING CAPITAL OR REVENUE FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHARITIES OR CHARITABLE PROJECTS, THAT SUPPORT THE LGBT COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL, IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETINGS, FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT. LGBT STANDS FOR LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER PEOPLE, AND REFERS TO SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT, BOTH PROTECTED CHARACTERISTICS UNDER THE EQUALITY ACT 2010.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Floor
Exmouth Town Hall
St Andrews Road
Exmouth
- Phone:
- 01395276167
- Email:
- Exmouthpride@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window