DISABILITY EDUCATION IN NEPAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 December 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Toan | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev Robert Charles Toan | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Subash Shiwakoti | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Lyn Angela Tulett | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS WITH DISABILITIES AT SCHOOLS IN NEPAL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THOSE SCHOOLS. TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING SCHOOLS SUPPORTING PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES OF ANY KIND (TO INCLUDE SOCIAL, PHYSICAL AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED DUE TO THEIR DISABILITY PARTICULARLY CHILDREN BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS OR ORGANISATIONS THAT SUPPORT SUCH PERSONS WITH GRANTS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 SUMMERLEIGH WALK
FAREHAM
PO14 2TQ
- Phone:
- 07846315210
- Email:
- davidtoan56@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window